Former Judges
Name | Duration |
---|---|
Smt. Shubha Gowdar | 07/08/2020 to 31/08/2024 |
P.N. Desai | 28/05/2018 to 01/11/2018 |
Umesh. M. Adiga | 19/12/2018 to 03/08/2020 |
Smt. Prabhavathi M. Hiremath | 01/06/2016 to 30/04/2018 |
H.S. Kamala | 28/11/2013 to 31/05/2016 |
B. Srinivasa Rao | 11/01/1995 to 29/05/1995 |
Syed Nisar Ahmed | 13/06/1994 to 03/12/1994 |
N.S. Sangolli | 02/01/1993 to 12/06/1994 |
Mohamed Anwar | 27/05/1991 to 01/01/1993 |
B.K. Sangalad | 09/06/1989 to 25/05/1991 |
Mohomed Asif | 02/06/1988 to 08/06/1989 |
R. Govindaraju | 25/05/1987 to 23/05/1988 |
J. Channaveerappa | 26/06/1986 to 24/05/1987 |
S.B. Tambad | 28/05/1984 to 26/06/1986 |
J. Channaveerappa | 28/02/1983 to 28/05/1984 |
N.S. Venugoapl | 12/05/1980 to 05/02/1983 |
P. Jayaram | 05/09/1979 to 12/05/1980 |
G.P. Jagadesh | 25/04/1974 to 06/11/1976 |
S.R. Puranik | 10/02/1977 to 30/05/1977 |
S.N. Kenchanna | 30/05/1977 to 12/07/1979 |