Former Judges
Name | Duration |
---|---|
Y.V. Bhimachar | 16/01/1974 to 12/04/1974 |
Syed Khaja Moinuddin | 24/05/1971 to 31/12/1973 |
S.B. Sawkar | 01/08/1970 to 19/05/1971 |
L. Linge Gowda | 05/04/1969 to 31/07/1970 |
R.B. Kulakarni | 18/12/1968 to 04/04/1969 |
N.S. Veerabhadraiah | 03/05/1995 to 25/04/1997 |
V. Jagannathan | 28/05/1997 to 15/02/2000 |
M.K. Sripathi | 03/04/2000 to 26/05/2003 |
C.R. Kumaraswamy | 26/05/2003 to 10/12/2003 |
S.V Papa Reddy | 01/11/1965 to 12/06/1966 |
H.S. Kempanna | 10/12/2003 to 21/05/2007 |
Prakash Ballari | 28/05/2007 to 30/04/2008 |
Smt. Rathnakala | 26/05/2008 to 20/05/2011 |
B.A Patil | 30/05/2011 to 10/10/2013 |
R Nagaraj | 05/06/1966 to 01/02/1967 |
Mirza Ahamed Ali Baig | 02/06/1967 to 17/02/1968 |